Global Patent Index - EP 1237424 A1

EP 1237424 A1 2002-09-11 - COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING THE PROLIFERATIVE RESPONSE DURING ADAPTATION OF THE GASTROINTESTINAL TRACT AND USE IN SHORT BOWEL SYNDROME

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING THE PROLIFERATIVE RESPONSE DURING ADAPTATION OF THE GASTROINTESTINAL TRACT AND USE IN SHORT BOWEL SYNDROME

Title (de)

ZUSAMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON PROLEVERATIVEN REAKTIONEN WÄHREND DER ANPASSUNG VOM UNTEREN INTESTINALEN BEREICH UND VERWENDUNG BEI "SHORT BOWEL" SYNDROM

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LA REPONSE PROLIFERATIVE DURANT L'ADAPTATION DU TRACTUS GASTRO-INTESTINAL ET UTILISATION DANS LE CADRE DU SYNDROME DE L'INTESTIN COURT

Publication

EP 1237424 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00984311 A

Priority

  • US 0033783 W
  • US 46675199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143570A1] Methods for the treatment of short bowel syndrome in patients in need thereof are provided, comprising the administration to the patients of an effective amount of a formulation comprising arachidonic acid and docosahexanoic acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 2/52 (2006.01); A23L 1/29 (2006.01); A23L 1/30 (2006.01); A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23L 33/12 (2016.08); A23L 33/40 (2016.08); A23V 2002/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/1868 + A23V 2250/1862

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143570A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143570 A1 20010621; AR 026988 A1 20030305; AU 2095101 A 20010625; BR 0016469 A 20020827; CA 2391259 A1 20010621; CN 1411347 A 20030416; CZ 20021960 A3 20030312; EA 200200687 A1 20030227; EP 1237424 A1 20020911; HU 0203654 A2 20030428; HU 0203654 A3 20031028; IL 149805 D0 20021110; JP 2003516946 A 20030520; KR 20030016211 A 20030226; MX PA02005940 A 20031014; NO 20022865 A 20020614; NO 20022865 D0 20020614; NZ 519932 A 20040227; PL 356781 A1 20040712; ZA 200205673 B 20040223

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-25 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1045796

2004-12-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040529

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031118

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VANDERHOOF, JON, ARVID

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAUERLY, KATHRYN, ANNE

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIEN, ERIC, LOUIS

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WALLINGFORD, JOHN, CHARLES

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020521;LT PAYMENT 20020521;LV PAYMENT 20020521;MK;RO PAYMENT 20020521;SI PAYMENT 20020521