Global Patent Index - EP 1237427 A1

EP 1237427 A1 2002-09-11 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FILTER CIGARETTES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRODUCING FILTER CIGARETTES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON FILTERZIGARETTEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE CIGARETTES A FILTRE

Publication

EP 1237427 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00990749 A

Priority

  • DE 19960672 A
  • EP 0012710 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143573A1] The invention relates to a device for producing filter cigarettes. The filter cigarettes are produced in several subsequent steps while being continuously conveyed. To this end, the device is provided with a main drum (17) as the central conveyor element that is provided on its circumference with a plurality of receptacles (18) for the components required for producing filter cigarettes (10). While the components and the cigarettes are conveyed by the main drum (17), the required production steps are carried out and the necessary materials are supplied by stationary stations that are located along the circumference of the drum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143573A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143573 A1 20010621; AU 3011601 A 20010625; DE 19960672 A1 20010628; EP 1237427 A1 20020911; EP 1237427 B1 20031008

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101214

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101214

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101214

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091209

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031008

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004025 P 20031113

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020418

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI