Global Patent Index - EP 1237470 A2

EP 1237470 A2 2002-09-11 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING PHOTOPLETHYSMOGRAPHIC ANALYTE MEASUREMENTS BY DE-WEIGHTING MOTION-CONTAMINATED DATA

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR IMPROVING PHOTOPLETHYSMOGRAPHIC ANALYTE MEASUREMENTS BY DE-WEIGHTING MOTION-CONTAMINATED DATA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON PHOTOPLETHYSMOGRAPHISCHEN ANALYTMESSUNGEN DURCH MINDERGEWRICHTUNG VON DATEN MIT BEWEGUNGSARTEFAKTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR AMELIORER LES MESURES D'ANALYTES PHOTOPLETHYSMOGRAPHIQUES PAR DELESTAGE DES DONNEES CONTAMINEES PAR LE MOUVEMENT

Publication

EP 1237470 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00992667 A

Priority

  • US 0042647 W
  • US 46588399 A
  • US 63215300 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143624A2] A system is provided for improving photoplethysmographic analyte measurements by de-emphasizing motion-contaminated data and/or emphasizing motion-free data. The system (100) is used in a measurement instrument which includes at least illumination source (104) for transmitting at least two light signals at two center wavelengths through a patient's appendage (106) and a sensor (108) for converting the light signals transmitted through the appendage into electrical output signals. The system (100) includes a first buffer (116) configured to temporarily store at least one pulse cycle of output signals received from the sensor (108). A motion estimator (122) quantifies an amount of motion associated with the output signals stored in the first buffer (116) by performing a principal component analysis on differential absorption values derived from the output signals. Based on the amount of motion estimated, a weight application module (118) is configured to associate a weight with the output signals in the first buffer. The weighted output signals are transferred into a second buffer (120) which contains weighted output signals collected over multiple pulse cycles. An analyte computing module (126) computes blood analyte related values based on the weighted output signals stored in the second buffer (120).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/7214 (2013.01); A61B 5/1455 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143624 A2 20010621; WO 0143624 A3 20020307; AU 4520201 A 20010625; EP 1237470 A2 20020911; EP 1237470 A4 20060426

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090114

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070118

2006-04-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060314

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020618

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI