Global Patent Index - EP 1237528 A1

EP 1237528 A1 2002-09-11 - COMPOSITION FOR PERMANENT BLEACHING OR DEFORMATION OF KERATIN FIBERS COMPRISING A THICKENED POLYMER WITH AN AMINOPLASTIC ETHER SK ELETON

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR PERMANENT BLEACHING OR DEFORMATION OF KERATIN FIBERS COMPRISING A THICKENED POLYMER WITH AN AMINOPLASTIC ETHER SK ELETON

Title (de)

EINE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ENTFÄRBUNG ODER DAUERHAFTEN VERFÖRMUNG VON KERATINISCHEN FASERN, DIE EIN VERDICKUNGSPOLYMER MIT EINER AMINOPLASTETHER HAUPTKETTE ENTHÄLT

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POUR LA DECOLORATION OU LA DEFORMATION PERMANENTE DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES COMPRENANT UN POLYMERE EPAISSISSANT A SQUELETTE AMINOPLASTE-ETHER

Publication

EP 1237528 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00979710 A

Priority

  • FR 0003144 W
  • FR 9915485 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141722A1] The invention relates to a composition for permanent bleaching or deformation of keratin fibers, especially human keratin fibers such as hair. The inventive composition comprises at least one reducing agent and at least one thickening polymer with an aminoplastic ether skeleton in an appropriate medium for bleaching or deformation. The invention also relates to methods and devices for permanent bleaching or deformation of keratin fibers by means of said composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/19 (2006.01); A61K 8/22 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/44 (2006.01); A61K 8/46 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/84 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61Q 5/04 (2006.01); A61Q 5/08 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 5/10 (2013.01); A61K 8/19 (2013.01); A61K 8/365 (2013.01); A61K 8/447 (2013.01); A61K 8/46 (2013.01); A61K 8/676 (2013.01); A61K 8/731 (2013.01); A61K 8/84 (2013.01); A61K 8/86 (2013.01); A61Q 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0141722A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141722 A1 20010614; AU 1711001 A 20010618; EP 1237528 A1 20020911; FR 2802093 A1 20010615; FR 2802093 B1 20020118; JP 2003516335 A 20030513; US 6984250 B1 20060110

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060627

2006-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/36 20060101AFI20060201BHEP

2006-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/67 20060101ALI20060201BHEP

2006-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/22 20060101ALI20060201BHEP

2006-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/08 20060101ALI20060201BHEP

2006-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/04 20060101ALI20060201BHEP

2004-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040510

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEGRAND, FREDERIC

2002-10-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALLARD, DELPHINE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI