Global Patent Index - EP 1237568 A1

EP 1237568 A1 2002-09-11 - A CONJUGATE OF A COLLAGEN II-BINDING FRAGMENT AND AN ARTHRITIS-AFFECTING PHARMACEUTICAL SUBSTANCE

Title (en)

A CONJUGATE OF A COLLAGEN II-BINDING FRAGMENT AND AN ARTHRITIS-AFFECTING PHARMACEUTICAL SUBSTANCE

Title (de)

KONJUGAT EINES KOLLAGEN II-BINDENDEN FRAGMENTES UND EINES ANTI-ARTHRITISARZNEIMITTEL

Title (fr)

CONJUGUE CONSTITUE D'UN FRAGMENT SE LIANT AU COLLAGENE II ET D'UN PRINCIPE ACTIF ANTI-ARTHRITIQUE

Publication

EP 1237568 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00980190 A

Priority

  • SE 0002293 W
  • SE 9904237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0137861A1] The invention provides a conjugate of a collagen II-binding chondroadherin fragment and an arthritis-affecting pharmaceutical substance, such as a cytokine, a cytokine antagonist and/or a protease inhibitor. It has turned out that chondroadherin specifically interacts with collagen II thereby forming a complex. Release of cartilage extracellular matrix components, such as chondroadherin and collagen II is a symptom of arthitis. By providing a conjugate according to the present invention it is therefore possible to direct arthitis-affecting pharmaceutical substances directly to the pathogenic tissue. The inventive conjugate can be manufactured by chemical crosslinking. In case the arthitis-affecting pharmaceutical substance is a protein or a peptide, the conjugate can be a fusion protein and be produced by genetic engineering techniques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/39; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/78 (2006.01); C07K 14/81 (2006.01); C07K 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/78 (2013.01); C07K 14/8146 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0137861A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0137861 A1 20010531; AU 1748601 A 20010604; CA 2392175 A1 20010531; EP 1237568 A1 20020911; JP 2003531109 A 20031021; SE 9904237 D0 19991122

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANAMAR MEDICAL AB

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031118

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEINEGARD, DICK

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MANSSON, BENGT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020524

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI