Global Patent Index - EP 1237570 A2

EP 1237570 A2 2002-09-11 - FRAGMENTS AND ANTAGONISTS OF HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN 60

Title (en)

FRAGMENTS AND ANTAGONISTS OF HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN 60

Title (de)

FRAGMENTE UND ANTAGONISTEN DES HEAT SHOCK PROTEINS 60

Title (fr)

FRAGMENTS ET ANTAGONISTES DE PROTEINES DE CHOC THERMIQUE 60

Publication

EP 1237570 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00981586 A

Priority

  • EP 00981586 A
  • EP 99125035 A
  • IL 0000833 W
  • US 17229799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143691A2] The invention identifies fragments of hsp60 which retain the capability of inducing a pro-inflammatory immune response of cells of the innate immune system. It is further disclosed the unexpectedfinding that smaller peptides derived from these fragments of hsp60 are capable of acting as antagonists of hsp60 insofar as they have the ability to reduce or even prevent the induction of a pro-inflammatory immune response by hsp60 in cells of the innate immune system. It further discloses variants, derivatives and analogs of such peptides, which are capable of acting as antagonists of hsp60 insofar as they have the ability to reduce or prevent the induction of a pro-inflammatory immune response by hsp60 in cells of the immune system. The invention also discloses pharmaceutical compositions comprising such peptide fragments or variants, derivatives and analogs thereof, and their use to prevent or ameliorate inflammatory diseases or disorders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/00; A01N 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A01N 63/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/02 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 21/04 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/08 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143691 A2 20010621; WO 0143691 A3 20020110; AU 1881601 A 20010625; AU 784623 B2 20060518; CA 2394504 A1 20010621; EP 1237570 A2 20020911; EP 1237570 A4 20050105; JP 2004501061 A 20040115; NZ 519348 A 20060428; ZA 200204635 B 20040526

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050929

2006-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEVELOGEN ISRAEL LTD

2005-01-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041122

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020611

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI