Global Patent Index - EP 1237602 A1

EP 1237602 A1 2002-09-11 - DRIP CHAMBER WITH MEMBRANE SUPPORT

Title (en)

DRIP CHAMBER WITH MEMBRANE SUPPORT

Title (de)

TROPFKAMMER MIT MEMBRANHALTERUNGSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

COMPTE-GOUTTES AVEC SUPPORT DE MEMBRANE

Publication

EP 1237602 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00960945 A

Priority

  • IL 0000560 W
  • IL 13349599 A
  • US 15200402 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141844A1] A membrane support (10, 20) for assembly into a drip chamber (5), characterized by a support member (7) having a longitudinal axis (8, 27), two ends (9) and at least one support face distanced from both ends (9) and generally parallel to the longitudinal axis (8, 27), a membrane (16, 26) joined to the at least one the support face, and a support member outlet (11, 32) formed in the support member (7) and in fluid communication with the membrane (16, 26), the support member outlet (11, 32) being fluidly communicable with an outlet of a drip chamber (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/38; A61M 5/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/14 (2006.01); A61M 5/165 (2006.01); A61M 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/1411 (2013.01); A61M 5/165 (2013.01); A61M 5/38 (2013.01); A61M 2005/1657 (2013.01); A61M 2205/7518 (2013.01); B29C 65/02 (2013.01); B29C 65/08 (2013.01); B29C 66/1222 (2013.01); B29C 66/1224 (2013.01); B29C 66/5346 (2013.01); B29C 66/612 (2013.01); B29C 66/73171 (2013.01); B29L 2031/753 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0141844A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141844 A1 20010614; AU 7309200 A 20010618; DE 60033846 D1 20070419; DE 60033846 T2 20071129; EP 1237602 A1 20020911; EP 1237602 B1 20070307; IL 133495 A 20061231; IL 133495 D0 20010430; US 2003220616 A1 20031127; US 2007142790 A1 20070621; US 7892204 B2 20110222

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140912

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140912

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60033846

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140912

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60033846

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2007-09-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60033846 P 20070419

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-06-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-03-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DRIP CHAMBER WITH MEMBRANE SUPPORT

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031211

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI