Global Patent Index - EP 1237681 A1

EP 1237681 A1 2002-09-11 - VISE-GRIP PLIERS

Title (en)

VISE-GRIP PLIERS

Title (de)

KLEMMZANGE

Title (fr)

PINCE-ETAU

Publication

EP 1237681 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00981445 A

Priority

  • FR 0003220 W
  • FR 9915692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143921A1] The inventive locking pliers comprise: a fixed assembly (2) consisting of a fixed jaw (4) at a front end (4) and a fixed handle (5) at a rear end; a mobile assembly (3) consisting of a moveable jaw (9) on the font end, mounted on the fixed assembly by means of a pivot (10), and a moveable handle (14) on a rear end; a knuckle joint (20) resting on a rear point (17) on the fixed assembly (2) and a front point (13) on the moveable jaw (9) being able to be actuated by the moveable handle (14); and at least one elongated hole (26) receiving the pivot (10) and comprising several notches (27,28) for positioning the latter. The elongated hole (26) has only two notches (27,28) a first notch (27) and a second notch (28) into which the pivot can pass from the first notch (27).

[origin: WO0143921A1] The inventive vise-grip pliers comprise: a fixed assembly (2) consisting of a fixed jaw (4) at a front end (4) and a fixed handle (5) at a rear end; a mobile assembly (3) consisting of a moveable jaw (9) on the font end, mounted on the fixed assembly by means of a pivot (10), and a moveable handle (14) on a rear end; a knuckle joint (20) resting on a rear point (17) on the fixed assembly (2) and a front point (13) on the moveable jaw (9) being ale to be actuated by the moveable handle (14); and at least one elongated hole (26) receiving the pivot (10) and comprising several notches (27,28) for positioning the latter. The elongated hole (26) has only two notches (27,28) a first notch (27) and a second notch (28) into which the pivot can pass from the first notch (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 7/12; B25B 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/10 (2006.01); B25B 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 7/10 (2013.01); B25B 7/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143921A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143921 A1 20010621; WO 0143921 A8 20020418; AU 1869201 A 20010625; DE 60005558 D1 20031030; EP 1237681 A1 20020911; EP 1237681 B1 20030924; FR 2802137 A1 20010615; FR 2802137 B1 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-08-10 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030924

2004-03-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030924

2004-01-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040104

2003-12-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031225

2003-12-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031224

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005558 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-04-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LOCKING PLIERS

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20020603;SI PAYMENT 20020603