Global Patent Index - EP 1237682 A1

EP 1237682 A1 2002-09-11 - HAND TOOL, IN PARTICULAR, A SCREWDRIVER

Title (en)

HAND TOOL, IN PARTICULAR, A SCREWDRIVER

Title (de)

HANDWERKZEUG, INSBESONDERE SCHRAUBWERKZEUG

Title (fr)

OUTIL A MAIN, NOTAMMENT TOURNEVIS

Publication

EP 1237682 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00989968 A

Priority

  • DE 19960657 A
  • DE 10053078 A
  • EP 0012430 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143922A1] The invention relates to a hand tool, in particular in the form of a screwdriver or a file, comprising one or more working surfaces with a grooved profile. According to the invention, the grooves are formed by recesses which are created using high-energy irradiation and which have border ribs. The border ribs can be formed by the edges of a fusion which immediately solidifies into a dish-shaped structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/00 (2006.01); B23K 26/38 (2006.01); B25B 13/00 (2006.01); B25B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143922A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143922 A1 20010621; CN 1214900 C 20050817; CN 1424954 A 20030618; DE 20022294 U1 20010726; EP 1237682 A1 20020911; EP 1237682 B1 20030709; ES 2197126 T3 20040101; US 2003196527 A1 20031023; US 6883405 B2 20050426

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WERA WERKZEUGE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WERA-WERK HERMANN WERNER GMBH & CO. KG, 42349 WUPPERTAL, DE

- Document: DE 50002874

2018-01-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002874

- Representative's name: RIEDER & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSAN, DE

2017-12-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-04 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197126 T3

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002874 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR