Global Patent Index - EP 1237698 A2

EP 1237698 A2 2002-09-11 - WATER UNSTABLE FOAM COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

WATER UNSTABLE FOAM COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

WASSERINSTABILE SCHAUMSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSANTS ALVEOLAIRES ET COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT LESDITS COMPOSANTS

Publication

EP 1237698 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00968655 A

Priority

  • GB 9923344 A
  • US 0027340 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2355014A] Foam components comprise polymeric material and an active ingredient, such as detergent ingredients, which are to be delivered to aqueous environment. Highly preferred active ingredients include enzymes. The foam component is stable upon contact with air but dissolves, disintegrates or disperses in water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 44/34; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/472 (2006.01); A61F 13/15 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/02 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/66 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61K 8/81 (2006.01); A61K 9/70 (2006.01); A61K 38/43 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/10 (2006.01); C08J 9/06 (2006.01); C08J 9/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/382 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0094 (2013.01); A61K 8/0208 (2013.01); A61K 8/046 (2013.01); A61Q 19/10 (2013.01); C08J 9/30 (2013.01); C11D 11/0058 (2013.01); C11D 17/00 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01); C11D 17/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2355014 A 20010411; GB 9923344 D0 19991208; AU 7853700 A 20010510; BR 0014530 A 20020604; CA 2385313 A1 20010412; CN 1378497 A 20021106; EP 1237698 A2 20020911; JP 2003511392 A 20030325; MX PA02003445 A 20020820; WO 0125390 A2 20010412; WO 0125390 A3 20010927; WO 0125390 B1 20011206

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060510

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050503

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CORRAND, DIDIER, MARCEL

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YORK, DAVID, WILLIAM

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOMMERVILLE-ROBERTS, NIGEL

2002-09-18 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010927

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI