Global Patent Index - EP 1237768 A1

EP 1237768 A1 2002-09-11 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR THE BRAKING SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR THE BRAKING SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR DIE BREMSANLAGE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DU SYSTEME DE FREINAGE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1237768 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01987718 A

Priority

  • DE 0103927 W
  • DE 10052290 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0232738A1] The invention relates to a control device for the brake system of a motor vehicle, comprising a pedal block (1) to which a brake pedal (10) is pivotably fixed, a brake booster (2) comprising a housing with a housing floor part (6) and a bell-shaped housing cover (5); and a master brake cylinder assembly (3) which is connected thereto, for hydraulically subjecting the individual wheel brakes of the motor vehicle to force. The pedal block (1) and the housing floor part (6) are formed as a single piece from plastic, the bell-shaped housing cover (5) and the master brake cylinder assembly (3), which has a reservoir (4) with a reservoir floor (4a) and a piston unit (14), also being formed as a single-piece plastic part. A hydraulic pipe (15), encased in a plastic part, for holding the individual brake pistons (17), is located inside the piston unit (14). This inventive configuration results in a particularly compactly constructed control device with both a reduced weight and a reduced number of individual components being used. Special configurations of the subject matter of the invention also allow the use of a tandem brake booster instead of the single brake booster known from the prior art.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 13/567; B60T 11/16; B60T 13/565

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 11/22 (2006.01); B60T 7/02 (2006.01); B60T 7/06 (2006.01); B60T 11/16 (2006.01); B60T 13/56 (2006.01); B60T 13/565 (2006.01); B60T 13/567 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 13/567 (2013.01); B60T 11/16 (2013.01); B60T 13/565 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0232738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0232738 A1 20020425; BR 0107337 A 20020827; DE 10052290 A1 20020508; EP 1237768 A1 20020911; JP 2004511393 A 20040415; MX PA02005392 A 20030128; US 2003025389 A1 20030206

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2007-11-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070502

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ERSOY, METIN

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROGOWSKI, WALDEMAR

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GROEGER, DIETER

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR