Global Patent Index - EP 1237787 A2

EP 1237787 A2 2002-09-11 - TRANSPORT CONTAINER FOR PACKING AND TRANSPORTING FOOD

Title (en)

TRANSPORT CONTAINER FOR PACKING AND TRANSPORTING FOOD

Title (de)

TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER ZUM VERPACKEN UND TRANSPORTIEREN VON LEBENSMITTELN

Title (fr)

CONTENANT DE TRANSPORT DESTINE A L'EMBALLAGE ET AU TRANSPORT DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES

Publication

EP 1237787 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00974541 A

Priority

  • DE 19955335 A
  • EP 0011311 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136274A2] The invention relates to a transport container (1) for packing and transporting deep-frozen food, especially ice-cream. At least one second container (3), which can be closed with said lid (4), is also provided. The containers (2, 3) are interconnected by said lid (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/02 (2006.01); B65D 21/04 (2006.01); B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/14 (2006.01); B65D 71/40 (2006.01); B65D 71/50 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01); B65D 81/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/14 (2013.01); B65D 21/0206 (2013.01); B65D 21/0209 (2013.01); B65D 21/04 (2013.01); B65D 43/0212 (2013.01); B65D 71/40 (2013.01); B65D 71/50 (2013.01); B65D 71/502 (2013.01); B65D 81/3205 (2013.01); B65D 81/3813 (2013.01); B65D 2251/08 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00194 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00527 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00657 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00759 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0136274A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136274 A2 20010525; WO 0136274 A3 20011108; AU 1280501 A 20010530; DE 19955335 A1 20010607; DE 19955335 B4 20060518; EP 1237787 A2 20020911; EP 1237787 B1 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081115

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081115

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-08-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-03-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-02-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003765 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEER, RICHARD

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GENIESER, NORBERT

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENGL, STEFAN

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOLTKAMP, INGO

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JORDAN, BERND

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MALDANER, MARIETTE

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRUEN, WALTER

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHOENIG, RALF

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEER, RICHARD

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GENIESER, NORBERT

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENGL, STEFAN

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOLTKAMP, INGO

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JORDAN, BERND

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MALDANER, MARIETTE

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GRUEN, WALTER

2002-10-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHOENIG, RALF

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI