Global Patent Index - EP 1237796 A1

EP 1237796 A1 2002-09-11 - SAFETY CAP

Title (en)

SAFETY CAP

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

CAPUCHON DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 1237796 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00985311 A

Priority

  • FR 0003266 W
  • FR 9915441 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140069A1] The invention concerns fluid product dispensing device (10) comprising a product reservoir, a dispensing member such as a pump, a dispensing head (15) provided with a dispensing orifice (16) and a fixing part (12, 13), and a safety cap (20) including fixing means (30) for fixing said cap (20) on said dispensing device (10), said fixing means (30) being detachable for removing said cap (20) before said dispensing device (10) is used, said fixing means (30) being removed by combining an axial pressure on said cap (20) along an axis (X) of said device and by rotating said cap (20) about said axis (X). The invention is characterised in that said cap (20) comprises fixing tabs (31) with a U-shaped end (32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 41/06; B65D 50/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 41/06 (2013.01); B05B 11/0027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140069A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140069 A1 20010607; CN 1187229 C 20050202; CN 1402686 A 20030312; DE 60011808 D1 20040729; DE 60011808 T2 20050714; EP 1237796 A1 20020911; EP 1237796 B1 20040623; FR 2801569 A1 20010601; FR 2801569 B1 20020426; JP 2003515507 A 20030507; JP 4764587 B2 20110907; US 6926174 B1 20050809

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151123

2015-11-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60011808

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALOIS S.A.S., LE NEUBOURG, FR

- Document: DE 60011808

- Effective date: 20130617

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011808 P 20040729

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR