Global Patent Index - EP 1237801 A1

EP 1237801 A1 2002-09-11 - DISPENSING AND DOSING DEVICE FOR BULK ITEMS

Title (en)

DISPENSING AND DOSING DEVICE FOR BULK ITEMS

Title (de)

AUSTRAGS- UND DOSIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHÜTTGÜTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION ET DE DOSAGE POUR MATIERES A DEVERSER

Publication

EP 1237801 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00979321 A

Priority

  • CH 0000666 W
  • CH 231199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2003103837A1] The invention relates to a dispensing and dosing device for bulk items containing a funnel-shaped receiving element for bulk items, embodied as a base body (1). A rotating ring (3) is surrounded on the outside by a bearing ring (6) which is secured to the base body (1). A toothed drive ring (10) is connected to the rotating ring (3) and is driven by a side pinion (12). An scraper (15) projects eccentrically up to a slider (20). The slider (20) can be moved at the side by a hand lever (22, 24). Said base body (1), rotating ring (3) and bearing ring (6) can be separated from each other and are sealed to each other. The inventive design facilitates simple and economically feasible construction, whereby the bulk item can be dispersed to the lowest discharge area.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/68; B65D 90/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/68 (2006.01); B65D 90/58 (2006.01); B65D 90/62 (2006.01); B65D 90/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/66 (2013.01); B65D 88/68 (2013.01); B65D 90/585 (2013.01); B65D 90/623 (2013.01); B65D 2590/542 (2013.01); B65D 2590/547 (2013.01); B65D 2590/664 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144080A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2003103837 A1 20030605; AT 304496 T 20050915; AU 1686201 A 20010625; DE 50011183 D1 20051020; EP 1237801 A1 20020911; EP 1237801 B1 20050914; WO 0144080 A1 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140605 AND 20140611

2013-11-08 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20131008

2013-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS AND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2013-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEGNO AG, AARAU, CH

- Document: DE 50011183

- Effective date: 20130319

2013-04-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ZEPPELIN SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LEGNO AG, CH

2012-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS AND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: LEGNO A.G.

- Effective date: 20051231

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060628

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-02-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060214

2005-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051225

2005-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-12-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011183 P 20051020

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050914

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI