Global Patent Index - EP 1237893 A1

EP 1237893 A1 2002-09-11 - Process for the preparation of magnesium (ether) sulphate pastes

Title (en)

Process for the preparation of magnesium (ether) sulphate pastes

Title (de)

Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von Magnesium (ether)sulfat-Pasten

Title (fr)

Procede de production de pates d'(ether)sulfate de magnesium

Publication

EP 1237893 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00989946 A

Priority

  • DE 19960098 A
  • EP 0012206 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144252A1] The invention relates to magnesium (ether) sulphate pastes, with a solids content of at least 30 wt. %, which are obtained by sulphating fatty alcohols and/or fatty alcohol ethoxylates, (II) treating the resulting sulphated product with an aqueous slurry of magnesium base, (III) then neutralising the magnesium base, contained in the resulting paste, by addition of an acid, to a pH-value of 2 to 5, (IV) and, finally, adjusting the pH-value to below 7 by means of bases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 3/00; C07C 303/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 303/24 (2006.01); C07F 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C07C 305/06 (2006.01); C07C 305/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C07C 303/24 (2013.01); C07F 3/003 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 303/24 + C07C 305/10
  2. C07C 303/24 + C07C 305/06

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144252A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144252 A1 20010621; DE 19960098 A1 20010621; EP 1237893 A1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-06-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MAGNESIUM (ETHER) SULPHATE PASTES

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR