Global Patent Index - EP 1237895 A2

EP 1237895 A2 2002-09-11 - PHOSPHORYLATION OF TERMINAL PRIMARY ALCOHOL GROUPS

Title (en)

PHOSPHORYLATION OF TERMINAL PRIMARY ALCOHOL GROUPS

Title (de)

PHOSPHORYLIERUNG VON TERMINALEN PRIMÄREN ALKOHOL- GRUPPEN

Title (fr)

PROCESSUS CHIMIQUES ET INTERMEDIAIRES

Publication

EP 1237895 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00979764 A

Priority

  • GB 0004527 W
  • GB 9928499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140236A2] The invention relates to chemical processes and chemical intermediates which are useful in the selective formation of a primary mono-phosphoryl group (-OPO(OH2)) in a terminal 1,2-diol-propanoyl (HO-CH2CH(OH)-CO-) containing system, and to chemical processes and chemical intermediates (and processes for their manufacture) particularly useful for the manufacture of anti-Gram positive oxazolidinone bacterial agents containing such functionality, in particular for the preparation of 5(R)-Isoxazol-3-yloxymethyl-3-(4-(1-(2(S) -hychoxy-3-phosphoryl-propanoyl)-1,2,5,6-tetrahydropyridy-4-il)3,5-difluorophenyl)oxazolidin-2-one.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 9/09; C07D 413/12; C07D 413/14; C07F 9/6558; C07F 9/6574

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 413/12 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01); C07F 9/09 (2006.01); C07F 9/6518 (2006.01); C07F 9/6558 (2006.01); C07F 9/6574 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 413/12 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01); C07F 9/091 (2013.01); C07F 9/65583 (2013.01); C07F 9/65742 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140236A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140236 A2 20010607; WO 0140236 A3 20020510; AR 026700 A1 20030226; AU 1715601 A 20010612; AU 762241 B2 20030619; BG 106728 A 20030228; BR 0016087 A 20020806; CA 2395052 A1 20010607; CN 1433421 A 20030730; CO 5271712 A1 20030430; CZ 20021912 A3 20020814; EE 200200282 A 20030616; EP 1237895 A2 20020911; GB 9928499 D0 20000202; HU 0204052 A2 20030328; IL 149641 D0 20021110; IS 6401 A 20020528; JP 2003515539 A 20030507; KR 20020058072 A 20020712; MX PA02005396 A 20021129; NO 20022605 A 20020626; NO 20022605 D0 20020531; PL 364762 A1 20041213; SK 7862002 A3 20030204; ZA 200203876 B 20030815

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1049009

2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI