Global Patent Index - EP 1237923 A2

EP 1237923 A2 2002-09-11 - HUMAN ION CHANNELS

Title (en)

HUMAN ION CHANNELS

Title (de)

HUMANE IONENKANÄLE

Title (fr)

CANAUX IONIQUES HUMAINS

Publication

EP 1237923 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00984339 A

Priority

  • US 0033829 W
  • US 46060299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144283A2] The present invention provides novel ion channel polypeptides and polynucleotides which identify and encode them. In addition, the invention provides expression vectors, host cells and methods for their production. The invention also provides methods for the identification of ion channel agonists/antagonists, useful for the treatment of human diseases and conditions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; A61K 38/17; A61P 25/00; C07K 16/28; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/86; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); C12N 2799/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144283A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144283 A2 20010621; WO 0144283 A3 20020221; AU 2097501 A 20010625; AU 784644 B2 20060518; CA 2393538 A1 20010621; EP 1237923 A2 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070326

2007-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2005-05-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY LLC

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020627;LT PAYMENT 20020627;LV PAYMENT 20020627;MK PAYMENT 20020627;RO PAYMENT 20020627;SI PAYMENT 20020627