Global Patent Index - EP 1237946 A1

EP 1237946 A1 2002-09-11 - AMINE-CONTAINING GRAFT POLYMERS, A METHOD FOR MAKING SAME, AND THEIR USE

Title (en)

AMINE-CONTAINING GRAFT POLYMERS, A METHOD FOR MAKING SAME, AND THEIR USE

Title (de)

AMIN ENTHALTENDE PFROPFPOLYMERE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

POLYMERES GREFFES CONTENANT DES AMINES, PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 1237946 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00973632 A

Priority

  • US 0028789 W
  • US 16033699 P
  • US 16044399 P
  • US 16044899 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0129095A1] Graft polymers containing primary amine functionality are prepared by reacting a thermoplastic polymer containing at least one electrophilic functionality sufficient to react with primary amine groups with a chemical compound having one primary amine group and at least one protected primary amine group. By utilization of the selected protecting groups, crosslink formation is essentially avoided. After grafting of the amine-containing compound, the protecting groups are removed and replaced with hydrogen atoms to restore primary amine functionality in the pendant amine group. By utilization of the selected deprotection processes, the chemical bonds in the amine compound and those binding the amine to the polymer are substantially unaffected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 8/30; C08F 8/34; C08L 23/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 8/00 (2006.01); C08F 8/30 (2006.01); C08F 8/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 8/30 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 8/30 + C08F 255/00
  2. C08F 8/00 + C08F 8/30 + C08F 255/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0129095A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0129095 A1 20010426; AU 1212601 A 20010430; CA 2388037 A1 20010426; CN 1390234 A 20030108; EP 1237946 A1 20020911; MX PA02003941 A 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040324

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXXONMOBIL CHEMICAL PATENTS INC.

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020427

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE