Global Patent Index - EP 1237993 A1

EP 1237993 A1 2002-09-11 - METHODS FOR PREPARING SOFT AND ELASTIC BIODEGRADABLE POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND POLYMER PRODUCTS COMPRISING SUCH COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

METHODS FOR PREPARING SOFT AND ELASTIC BIODEGRADABLE POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE COPOLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND POLYMER PRODUCTS COMPRISING SUCH COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WEICHEN UND ELASTISCHEN BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREN POLYHYDROXYALKANOAT-COPOLYMERENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND POLYMERPRODUKTEN DIE DIESE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSITIONS DE COPOLYMERE POLYHYDROXYALKANOATE, DOUX ET ELASTIQUE, BIODEGRADABLE ET PRODUITS A BASE DE POLYMERES COMPRENANT CES COMPOSITIONS

Publication

EP 1237993 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00976713 A

Priority

  • US 0029885 W
  • US 16208399 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0130893A1] Soft and elastic polymer products are obtained by stretching a composition comprising a biodegradable polyhydroxyalkanoate copolymer comprising at least two randomly repeating monomer units. The first randomly repeating monomer unit has structure (I), wherein R<1> is H, or C1 or C2 alkyl, and n is 1 or 2. The second randomly repeating monomer unit is different from the first randomly repeating monomer unit and has structure (II), wherein m is 2 to about 9. At least about 70 mole % of the copolymer comprises randomly repeating monomer units having the structure of the first randomly repeating monomer unit (I). The products exhibit advantageous combinations of softness and elasticity while maintaining strength.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08J 5/18; A61L 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/00 (2006.01); A61L 15/26 (2006.01); A61L 15/62 (2006.01); C08G 63/06 (2006.01); C08J 5/18 (2006.01); C08L 101/16 (2006.01); D01F 6/84 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/18 (2013.01); A61L 15/26 (2013.01); A61L 15/62 (2013.01); C08J 2367/04 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61L 15/26 + C08L 67/04

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0130893A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0130893 A1 20010503; AU 1444801 A 20010508; BR 0015142 A 20020625; CA 2387075 A1 20010503; CA 2387075 C 20070710; CN 1235950 C 20060111; CN 1384851 A 20021211; EP 1237993 A1 20020911; JP 2003513131 A 20030408; KR 20020040917 A 20020530

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEREDIAN, INC.

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040427

2004-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040427

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020419

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI