Global Patent Index - EP 1238054 A1

EP 1238054 A1 2002-09-11 - WASHING AGENT, RINSING AGENT OR CLEANING AGENT PORTIONS WITH ENZYME-CONTROLLED ACTIVE INGREDIENT RELEASE

Title (en)

WASHING AGENT, RINSING AGENT OR CLEANING AGENT PORTIONS WITH ENZYME-CONTROLLED ACTIVE INGREDIENT RELEASE

Title (de)

WASCHMITTEL-, SPÜLMITTEL- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTEL-PORTIONEN MIT EN ZYM-KONTROLLIERTER WIRKSTOFF-FREISETZUNG

Title (fr)

FRACTION DE PRODUIT DE LAVAGE, DE PRODUIT DE RIN AGE OU DE PRODUIT DE NETTOYAGE A LIBERATION DU PRINCIPE ACTIF REGULEE PAR DES ENZYMES

Publication

EP 1238054 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00989940 A

Priority

  • DE 19960072 A
  • EP 0012130 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2328326A1] The invention relates to a laundry, dishwashing or cleaning product detergent portion having two or more detersive components of which at least two are to be released into the liquor at different points in time in a laundering, dishwashing or cleaning process, said portion comprising at least one release controlling (physico)chemical switch which is not subject or not exclusively subject to temperature control, and also one or more substances for increasing the extent of the shift in pH.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/386; C11D 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 3/3769 (2013.01); C11D 3/3792 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 17/041 (2013.01); C11D 17/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144434A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10035781 A1 20010712; AT 346134 T 20061215; AT 354633 T 20070315; AU 1706901 A 20010625; AU 2671301 A 20010625; AU 2839701 A 20010625; CA 2328326 A1 20010613; DE 50013790 D1 20070104; DE 50014097 D1 20070405; EP 1238054 A1 20020911; EP 1238054 B1 20061122; EP 1238054 B2 20120620; EP 1238055 A2 20020911; EP 1238055 B1 20070221; ES 2277865 T3 20070801; ES 2277865 T5 20121102; ES 2281378 T3 20071001; WO 0144421 A2 20010621; WO 0144421 A3 20011101; WO 0144434 A1 20010621; WO 0144435 A1 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151202

2016-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 346134 T

- Effective date: 20151202

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2012-11-02 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Document: ES 2277865 T5

- Effective date: 20121102

2012-08-09 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50013790

- Effective date: 20120620

2012-06-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20120620

2012-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061122

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061202

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070223

2008-03-14 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-10-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V. (NL) / UNILEVER PLC (GB)

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2277865 T3

2007-06-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-04-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070423

2007-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070216

2007-02-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-02-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013790 P 20070104

2006-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061122

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO;SI