Global Patent Index - EP 1238062 A1

EP 1238062 A1 2002-09-11 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR HALOGENATION REACTIONS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR HALOGENATION REACTIONS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR HALOGENIERUNGREAKTIONEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES RELATIFS A DES REACTIONS D'HALOGENATION

Publication

EP 1238062 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00979674 A

Priority

  • EP 0012347 W
  • US 22880199 P
  • US 21934300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144447A1] This invention describes methods, transgenic plants and transgenic microorganisms for the biosynthesis of halogenated natural products, where the halogenation is substrate and regiospecific. In particular, this invention relates to the use of halogenated metabolites, produced by the method of the invention, for the protection of host organisms against pathogens, more particularly, to the protection of plants against phytopathogens. In this aspect, the invention provides transgenic plants with enhanced resistance to phytopathogens, and biocontrol organisms with enhanced biocontrol properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/02; A01N 63/00; C07K 14/21; C12N 5/10; C12N 5/14; C12N 9/10; C12N 15/53; C12N 15/54; C12N 15/82; C12P 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 5/00 (2006.01); A01N 63/00 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/53 (2006.01); C12N 15/54 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12P 13/22 (2006.01); C12P 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0036 (2013.01); A01N 63/02 (2013.01); C12N 15/8243 (2013.01); C12N 15/8279 (2013.01); C12P 13/227 (2013.01); C12P 17/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144447A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144447 A1 20010621; AR 026939 A1 20030305; AU 1707801 A 20010625; AU 772124 B2 20040408; BR 0017024 A 20030107; CA 2393910 A1 20010621; CN 1409759 A 20030409; EA 004942 B1 20041028; EA 200200634 A1 20021226; EP 1238062 A1 20020911; HU 0203807 A2 20030228; HU 0203807 A3 20041028; IL 150084 D0 20021201; JP 2003516749 A 20030520; MX PA02005868 A 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1050547

2006-12-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060701

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040526

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STEFFENS, JOHN

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BATIE, CHRIS

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DIETZ, JON, MARQUIS

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DONG, JIAN

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAMDAR, KIM, PULOMA

2002-09-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HILL, STEVE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI