Global Patent Index - EP 1238106 A2

EP 1238106 A2 2002-09-11 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DRUG SCREENING BASED 0ON NUCLEIC ACID ANALYSIS

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DRUG SCREENING BASED 0ON NUCLEIC ACID ANALYSIS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DROGENUNTERSUCHUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG DER NUKLEINSÄUREANALYSE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET METHODES DE CRIBLAGE DE MEDICAMENTS

Publication

EP 1238106 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00980832 A

Priority

  • US 0032387 W
  • US 16945799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142503A2] The present invention provides kits and methods for screening drugs and drug candidates for activity by determining the presence or absence of high integrity nucleic acid in a sample.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/531 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/136 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142503A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142503 A2 20010614; WO 0142503 A3 20011227; AU 1804401 A 20010618; CA 2393864 A1 20010614; EP 1238106 A2 20020911; JP 2003516162 A 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040616

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXACT SCIENCES CORPORATION

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030422

2002-10-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DRUG SCREENING BASED ON NUCLEIC ACID ANALYSIS

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR