Global Patent Index - EP 1238112 A2

EP 1238112 A2 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR THE PARALLEL DETECTION OF THE DEGREE OF METHYLATION OF GENOMIC DNA

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PARALLEL DETECTION OF THE DEGREE OF METHYLATION OF GENOMIC DNA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PARALLELEN DETEKTION DES METHYLIERUNGSZUSTANDES VON GENOMISCHER DNA

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DETECTION PARALLELE DE L'ETAT DE METHYLATION D'ADN GENOMIQUE

Publication

EP 1238112 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00989842 A

Priority

  • DE 0004381 W
  • DE 19959691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142493A2] The invention relates to a method for the parallel detection of the degree of methylation of genomic DNA wherein the following the steps are performed: (a) chemical treatment at the 5' position of non-methylated cytosine bases converts said bases into uracil, thymidine or another base which exhibits hybridization behavior different to that of cytosine in a genomic DNA sample; (b) more than ten different fragments, each having less than 2000 base pairs in said chemically treated genomic DNA sample, are amplified simultaneously using synthetic oligonucleotides as a primer, whereby said primers each contain genomic sequences which are involved in gene regulation and/or transcribed and/or translated, such as those sequences which should be obtained after execution of steps (a); (c) the sequence contexts of all or a portion of the CpG dinucleotides or CpNpG trinucleotides contained in the amplified fragments are determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6858 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12Q 1/6858 + C12Q 2537/143 + C12Q 2523/125

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142493A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142493 A2 20010614; WO 0142493 A3 20020207; AU 2663201 A 20010618; AU 778411 B2 20041202; CA 2395047 A1 20010614; DE 10083729 D2 20030515; DE 19959691 A1 20010816; EP 1238112 A2 20020911; US 2004248090 A1 20041209

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070918

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050127

2005-06-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPIGENOMICS AG

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050127

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OLEK, ALEXANDER

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PIEPENBROCK, CHRISTIAN

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020705;LT PAYMENT 20020705;LV PAYMENT 20020705;MK PAYMENT 20020705;RO PAYMENT 20020705;SI PAYMENT 20020705