Global Patent Index - EP 1238117 A1

EP 1238117 A1 2002-09-11 - AGENT AND METHOD FOR ENZYMATICALLY TANNING SKINS

Title (en)

AGENT AND METHOD FOR ENZYMATICALLY TANNING SKINS

Title (de)

MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENZYMATISCHEN GERBEN VON HÄUTEN

Title (fr)

AGENT ET PROCEDE DE TANNAGE ENZYMATIQUE DES PEAUX

Publication

EP 1238117 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01974077 A

Priority

  • DE 10042993 A
  • EP 0107586 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0218662A1] The invention relates to an agent and method for enzymatically tanning skins, in which one or more transglutaminases are used for cross-linking the collagen present in the skin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14C 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14C 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0218662A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0218662 A1 20020307; AT 264926 T 20040515; DE 10042993 A1 20020328; DE 10042993 B4 20050915; EP 1238117 A1 20020911; EP 1238117 B1 20040421; ES 2217188 T3 20041101; US 2002155524 A1 20021024; US 6849095 B2 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080704

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080703

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070727

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-07-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070725

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217188 T3

2004-10-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-06-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TRUMPLER GMBH & CO. KG, CHEMISCHE FABRIK

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50102047 P 20040527

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020126

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR