Global Patent Index - EP 1238125 A1

EP 1238125 A1 2002-09-11 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF COLLOIDAL ROD PARTICLES AS NANOBAR CODES

Title (en)

METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF COLLOIDAL ROD PARTICLES AS NANOBAR CODES

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR KOLLOIDALE STABPARTIKEL ALS NANOBARKODE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE PARTICULES CYLINDRIQUES COLLOIDALES EN TANT QUE NANO CODE-BARRES

Publication

EP 1238125 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00977296 A

Priority

  • US 0041049 W
  • US 15732699 P
  • US 18915100 P
  • US 19024700 P
  • US 19461600 P
  • US 21216700 P
  • US 59839500 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0125510A1] An apparatus and synthetic methods for manufacture of segmented nanoparticles are described. The nanoparticles of the present invention may be comprised of any material, including metal, metal chalcogenide, a metal oxide, a metal sulfide, a metal selenide, a metal telluride, a metal alloy, a metal nitride, a metal phosphide, a metal antimonide, a semiconductor, a semi-metal or any organic or inorganic material. The method employs electrochemical deposition of metals inside a template wherein the process is improved, separately and collectively, by i) electroplating in an ultrasonication bath; and ii) controlling the temperature of the deposition environment, preferably by using a recirculating temperature bath.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 5/02; C30B 30/02; G01N 33/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 1/00 (2006.01); B01J 13/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/10 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); C25D 1/04 (2006.01); C25D 1/20 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); H01F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/54346 (2013.01); B01J 13/0047 (2013.01); B01J 13/0091 (2013.01); B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); B01J 19/10 (2013.01); B22F 1/004 (2013.01); B82Y 25/00 (2013.01); B82Y 30/00 (2013.01); C25D 1/04 (2013.01); H01F 1/0081 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2999/00 + B22F 1/004 + B22F 2207/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0125510 A1 20010412; AU 1495101 A 20010510; CA 2387992 A1 20010412; EP 1238125 A1 20020911; EP 1238125 A4 20040818; JP 2003511556 A 20030325; MX PA02003284 A 20021004

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-08-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 25D 5/02 A

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 30B 30/02 B

2004-08-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/58 B

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SURROMED, INC.

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SURROMED, INC.

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NATAN, MICHAEL, J.

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MALLOUK, THOMAS, E.

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARTIN, BENJAMIN, R.

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: REISS, BRIAN, D.

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DIETZ, LOUIS, J.

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WINKLER, JAMES, L.

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI