Global Patent Index - EP 1238177 A1

EP 1238177 A1 2002-09-11 - EXTERIOR DOOR HANDLE SYSTEM

Title (en)

EXTERIOR DOOR HANDLE SYSTEM

Title (de)

TÜRAUSSENGRIFFANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE POIGNEE EXTERIEURE DE PORTE

Publication

EP 1238177 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00993269 A

Priority

  • DE 29923706 U
  • EP 0011909 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140607A1] The invention relates to an exterior door handle system and to a method for controlling a motor vehicle door lock system. The aim of the invention is to provide a system for identifying the actuation of an exterior door handle by simple and inexpensive means. To this end, the exterior door handle can be elastically deformed and the deformation is detected by a sensor to identify an actuation of the door handle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2014.01); E05B 81/76 (2014.01); E05B 85/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/10 (2013.01); E05B 81/76 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5898 (2015.04); Y10T 70/65 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7068 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140607A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140607 A1 20010607; DE 50011082 D1 20051006; EP 1238177 A1 20020911; EP 1238177 B1 20050824; EP 1238177 B2 20090325; EP 1240400 A1 20020918; EP 1240400 B1 20050831; US 2003029210 A1 20030213; US 2003101781 A1 20030605; WO 0140606 A1 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151129

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011038

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141112

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141110

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011038

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2009-03-25 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-07-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011038 P 20050929

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BROSE SCHLIESSSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI