Global Patent Index - EP 1238189 A1

EP 1238189 A1 2002-09-11 - DEVICE FOR MODIFYING COMPRESSION RATE TO OPTIMIZE OPERATING CONDITIONS OF RECIPROCATING PISTON ENGINES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MODIFYING COMPRESSION RATE TO OPTIMIZE OPERATING CONDITIONS OF RECIPROCATING PISTON ENGINES

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DES VERDICHTUNGSVERHÄLTNISSES FÜR DIE BETRIEBSZUSTANDSOPTIMIERUNG EINER HUBKOLBENMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR MODIFIER LE TAUX DE COMPRESSION AFIN D'OPTIMISER LE FONCTIONNEMENT DES MOTEURS A PISTONS ALTERNATIFS

Publication

EP 1238189 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00985347 A

Priority

  • FR 0003324 W
  • FR 9915104 A
  • FR 0008947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0140641A1] The invention concerns the modification of compression rate by using technological components similar to conventional components of engines. The turbines (26) and (81) mounted to operate in opposite direction drive a screw (32) and displace the pivot (29) which articulates the rod (35) integral with an eccentric (8a) located between the rod small end (6a) and the crankpin (5). The invention is particularly designed to increase power performance and reduce polluting waste in engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 15/02; F02B 75/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/22 (2006.01); F02B 75/32 (2006.01); F02D 15/02 (2006.01); F02D 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/045 (2013.01); F02B 75/04 (2013.01); F02B 75/047 (2013.01); F02B 75/22 (2013.01); F02D 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0140641A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0140641 A1 20010607; WO 0140641 A9 20010809; AU 2179601 A 20010612; DE 60017940 D1 20050310; DE 60017940 T2 20050630; EP 1238189 A1 20020911; EP 1238189 B1 20050202; ES 2237479 T3 20050801; JP 2003515696 A 20030507; JP 4505170 B2 20100721; US 6789515 B1 20040914

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60017940

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161205

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121129

2014-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140516

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111128

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICHEL MARCHISSEAU, INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, , FR

- Document: DE 60017940

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARCHISSEAU, MICHEL, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MICHEL MARCHISSEAU, INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, , FR

- Document: DE 60017940

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: MARCHISSEAU, MICHEL, LIMOGES, FR; INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 60017940

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARCHISSEAU, MICHEL, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: MARCHISSEAU, MICHEL, LIMOGES, FR; INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, RUEIL-MALMAISON, HAUTS-DE-SEINE, FR

- Document: DE 60017940

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237479 T3

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017940 P 20050310

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCHISSEAU, MICHEL

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANEAIS DU PETROLE

2004-08-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MARCHISSEAU, MICHEL

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR MODIFYING COMPRESSION RATE TO OPTIMIZE OPERATING CONDITIONS OF RECIPROCATING PISTON ENGINES

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI