Global Patent Index - EP 1238190 A2

EP 1238190 A2 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE STARTING PERFORMANCE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE ACCUMULATOR INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE STARTING PERFORMANCE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE COMPRISING A HIGH-PRESSURE ACCUMULATOR INJECTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES STARTVERHALTENS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT HOCHDRUCK-SPEICHEREINSPRITZSYSTEM

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LE DEMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE EQUIPE D'UN SYSTEME D'INJECTION HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1238190 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00993428 A

Priority

  • DE 0004416 W
  • DE 19960546 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144638A2] In order to rapidly recognise the starting operation of an internal combustion engine (BKM) equipped with a high-pressure accumulator injection system, the system variable battery voltage (VB) is evaluated. Once the ignition has been started, the battery voltage (VB) of the motor vehicle which is equipped with the internal combustion engine (BKM) is monitored. The occurrence of a voltage dip in the operating voltage (VB), induced by the excitation of a starter (30) of an internal combustion engine (BKM) is used as the moment (t2) for triggering at least one of the hydraulic control members (volumetric-flow control valve VCV, pressure control valve PCV).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01); F02N 19/00 (2010.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02D 41/3845 (2013.01); F02M 2200/40 (2013.01); F02N 11/08 (2013.01); F02N 11/0848 (2013.01); F02N 19/00 (2013.01); F02N 2200/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144638A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144638 A2 20010621; WO 0144638 A3 20011227; EP 1238190 A2 20020911; EP 1238190 B1 20040922

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007937

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091212

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007937 P 20041028

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PRZYMUSINSKI, ACHIM

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PHILIPPI, UDO

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR