Global Patent Index - EP 1238191 A1

EP 1238191 A1 2002-09-11 - BOTTOM COVERING OF A COOLING CHAMBER FOR PISTONS OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

BOTTOM COVERING OF A COOLING CHAMBER FOR PISTONS OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

UNTERE ABDECKUNG EINES KÜHLRAUMES FÜR KOLBEN VON VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN

Title (fr)

RECOUVREMENT INFERIEUR DE LA CHAMBRE DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR PISTONS DE MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1238191 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00988687 A

Priority

  • DE 0004358 W
  • DE 19960913 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144645A1] The aim of the invention is to provide an easy fastening of a tubular supply or a vertical pipe in a bottom covering of a cooling chamber for pistons of internal combustion engines, e.g. in a circular covering of a cooling channel of an articulated-skirt piston. To this end, the vertical tube or the tubular supply is clipped into the bottom covering or is fastened thereto by a detent connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/22; F16B 2/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/10 (2006.01); F02F 3/22 (2006.01); F16J 1/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2013.01); Y10S 285/921 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144645A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144645 A1 20010621; BR 0016461 A 20020827; BR 0016461 B1 20081118; DE 19960913 A1 20010621; EP 1238191 A1 20020911; EP 1238191 B1 20050720; JP 2003517139 A 20030520; US 2002178910 A1 20021205; US 6722263 B2 20040420

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010778 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR