Global Patent Index - EP 1238194 A1

EP 1238194 A1 2002-09-11 - EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION DEVICE

Title (en)

EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION DEVICE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUR ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE RECIRCULATION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 1238194 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00991170 A

Priority

  • DE 19960998 A
  • EP 0012573 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19960998C1] The exhaust gas recycling device has a self-operating no-return valve (10) in the exhaust gas collector line (5), which permits an overflow of the exhaust gas from the region of the collector line connected to the exhaust gas recycling line (7), depending on the current pressure difference. The gas flows to another region of the line bounded by the valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 21/08 (2006.01); F02M 26/10 (2016.01); F02M 26/16 (2016.01); F02M 26/39 (2016.01); F02M 26/43 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/43 (2016.02); F02M 26/10 (2016.02); F02M 26/16 (2016.02); F02M 26/39 (2016.02); F02M 26/05 (2016.02); F02M 26/23 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144650A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19960998 C1 20010215; EP 1238194 A1 20020911; EP 1238194 B1 20050309; ES 2237493 T3 20050801; JP 2003519311 A 20030617; US 2002189598 A1 20021219; US 6752132 B2 20040622; WO 0144650 A1 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081212

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081213

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081213

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081212

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2006-02-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237493 T3

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR