Global Patent Index - EP 1238195 A2

EP 1238195 A2 2002-09-11 - CONTROLLABLE IGNITION CIRCUIT

Title (en)

CONTROLLABLE IGNITION CIRCUIT

Title (de)

STEUERBARE ZÜNDSCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR D'ALLUMAGE CONTROLABLE

Publication

EP 1238195 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00984610 A

Priority

  • AT 0000346 W
  • AT 213499 A
  • AT 2122000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144655A2] The invention relates to an ignition circuit for an externally-ignited internal combustion engine, especially a high-compression internal combustion engine, comprising an ignition coil (3) which is secondarily connected to a spark plug (4) and whose primary winding (L1) is series-connected to an electronic switch (T1, T2), this series connection being connected to a direct voltage source (U) whose control electrode is connected to a pulse generator (1) which supplies at least one control pulse for a predetermined ignition period. The invention provides that the ignition coil (3) is configured as a separate-winding transformer whose primary winding (L1) is connected in the shunt arm of a bridge circuit with an arm consisting of a series connection of two electronic switches (T1, T2) of the same type. A diode (D1, D2) is connected to each of the electronic switches (T1, T2) in antiparallel, respectively, and the pulse generator (1) subjects said electronic switches (T1, T2) to several pulses that are phase-shifted about 180 DEG , respectively, during the predetermined ignition period. In this way, the invention achieves a considerable degree of ignition reliability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 3/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02P 3/051 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0144655A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144655 A2 20010621; WO 0144655 A3 20020321; AU 2126201 A 20010625; DE 50009885 D1 20050428; EP 1238195 A2 20020911; EP 1238195 B1 20050323

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081218

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091218

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009885 P 20050428

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2004-11-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE FR IT LI

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI