Global Patent Index - EP 1238196 A2

EP 1238196 A2 2002-09-11 - WIND TURBINE ROTOR, AND HUB AND EXTENDER THEREFOR

Title (en)

WIND TURBINE ROTOR, AND HUB AND EXTENDER THEREFOR

Title (de)

WINDTURBINENROTOR, SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE NABE UND VERLÄNGERUNGSSTÜCK

Title (fr)

ROTOR POUR EOLIENNE ET MOYEU ET RALLONGE CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 1238196 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00989036 A

Priority

  • NL 0000872 W
  • NL 1013807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142647A2] The invention relates to a rotor for a wind turbine, which wind turbine comprises: a support construction, for instance a post, a column or a spatial tube construction; and a generator supported by this support construction and having an outward protruding horizontal shaft which is rotatably mounted and carries a generator rotor forming part of the generator; which rotor comprises the following rotor parts: a hub with first coupling means for releasable rigid coupling of the hub in coaxial relation to the end of the shaft; and a number of blades which are coupled rigidly and releasably to the hub by means of respective second coupling means via the ends of their respective blade roots; wherein the hub and each blade root consist of composite material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03D 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03D 9/02 (2006.01); F03D 1/06 (2006.01); F03D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03D 1/0658 (2013.01); F03D 1/0691 (2013.01); F05B 2240/14 (2013.01); F05B 2240/912 (2013.01); F05B 2240/9121 (2013.01); F05B 2240/913 (2013.01); F05B 2280/6003 (2013.01); F05C 2253/04 (2013.01); Y02E 10/721 (2013.01); Y02E 10/728 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142647A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES GB LI LU PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142647 A2 20010614; WO 0142647 A3 20020131; AU 2558001 A 20010618; AU 773676 B2 20040603; EP 1238196 A2 20020911; NL 1013807 C2 20010705; RU 2002118216 A 20040127

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070302

2006-07-19 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-07-19 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOI IMMOBILIEN- UND VERMOEGENSVERWALTUNGSGESELLSCH

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES GB LI LU PT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI