Global Patent Index - EP 1238251 A1

EP 1238251 A1 2002-09-11 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE ANGLE AND/OR THE ANGULAR VELOCITY OF A ROTATABLE BODY AND/OR THE TORQUE ACTING UPON SAID BODY

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE ANGLE AND/OR THE ANGULAR VELOCITY OF A ROTATABLE BODY AND/OR THE TORQUE ACTING UPON SAID BODY

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DES WINKELS UND/ODER DER WINKELGESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES DREHBAREN KÖRPERS UND/ODER DES AUF IHN WIRKENDEN DREHMOMENTS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER UN ANGLE ET/OU LA VITESSE ANGULAIRE D'UN CORPS ROTATIF ET/OU LE COUPLE DE ROTATION APPLIQUE A CE DERNIER

Publication

EP 1238251 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00993336 A

Priority

  • DE 0004335 W
  • DE 19958598 A
  • DE 10041095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0142753A1] The invention relates to a device for measuring an angle and/or a torque on a rotatable body. The angle of rotation is detected by means of magnetic or optical sensors. In a preferred embodiment, two devices (7, 8) are provided that are provided with two optically readable code traces respectively. The two code traces (1a, 1b or 2a, 2b) of a device (7 or 8) are embodied in the same way and are arranged in such a way that said devices are offset against each other so that allocated sensors (4) output a digital signal. The angle of rotation is calculated from the offset of the two digital signals. In another embodiment, a torsional element (5) having a known torsional stiffness is arranged between the two devices (7, 8). A torque that is transmitted by the rotatable body (3) can thus by calculated from the difference angle of the two devices (7, 8). The inventive device is preferably used in the steering axle of a motor vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01L 3/12; G01B 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62D 5/04 (2006.01); B62D 5/06 (2006.01); B62D 15/02 (2006.01); G01B 11/26 (2006.01); G01D 5/245 (2006.01); G01D 5/30 (2006.01); G01L 3/12 (2006.01); G01L 5/22 (2006.01); G01M 3/12 (2006.01); G01P 3/486 (2006.01); G01P 3/487 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62D 15/0215 (2013.01); B62D 6/10 (2013.01); G01D 5/2451 (2013.01); G01L 3/12 (2013.01); G01L 5/221 (2013.01); G01M 3/12 (2013.01); G01P 3/486 (2013.01); G01P 3/487 (2013.01); B60G 2204/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0142753A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0142753 A1 20010614; AU 2828501 A 20010618; AU 775247 B2 20040722; EP 1238251 A1 20020911; US 2003145663 A1 20030807; US 6935193 B2 20050830

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20121203

2012-12-03 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070308

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEISENBERG, DAVID

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KLOTZBUECHER, THOMAS

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAAS, GUNTHER

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DORFMUELLER, LUTZ

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIEGLE, HENRIK

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WENZLER, AXEL

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARX, KLAUS

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOST, FRANZ

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NOLTEMEYER, RALF

2003-03-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FREITAG, MARTIN

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020708

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR