Global Patent Index - EP 1238258 A1

EP 1238258 A1 2002-09-11 - AN APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION RELATING TO TWO OR MORE PARTICLES, BUBBLES, AND/OR DROPLETS

Title (en)

AN APPARATUS AND A METHOD FOR PROVIDING INFORMATION RELATING TO TWO OR MORE PARTICLES, BUBBLES, AND/OR DROPLETS

Title (de)

EINE VORRICHTUNG UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR LIEFERUNG VON INFORMATION BEZÜGLICH ZWEIER ODER MEHR TEILCHEN, BLASEN UND/ODER TRÖPFCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR DES INFORMATIONS CONCERNANT AU MOINS DEUX PARTICULES, BULLES, ET/OU GOUTTELETTES

Publication

EP 1238258 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00974355 A

Priority

  • DE 19954702 A
  • DK 0000630 W
  • US 23154400 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0136937A1] Providing information relating to two or more illuminated particles, bubbles, and/or droplets where the light providers are positioned so, relatively to the two or more particles, bubbles, and/or droplets and the detecting means, that at least two waves are reflected or refracted by the two or more particles, bubbles, and/or droplets toward the detector, the waves all having been either reflected by the two or more particles, bubbles, and/or droplets or all having been refracted a predetermined number of times within the two or more particles, bubbles, and/or droplets, the information being derived from spatial information from interfering waves generated when the waves from each of the two or more particles, bubbles, and/or droplets interfere on different parts of a sensitive area of the area detector or the line detector. Also, when more than one interfering pattern is used, the light waves from the particles may be refracted to reflected any number of times.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 15/02 (2006.01); G01N 21/85 (2006.01); G01N 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/85 (2013.01); G01N 15/0211 (2013.01); G01N 2015/0011 (2013.01); G01N 2015/0026 (2013.01); G01N 2015/0294 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0136937A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0136937 A1 20010525; AU 1270001 A 20010530; EP 1238258 A1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070224

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061013

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAMASCHKE, NILS

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TROPEA, CAMERON

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STIEGELMEIER, MANFRED

2002-11-06 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAMASCHKE, NILS

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TROPEA, CAMERON

2002-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEIGLMEIER, MANFRED

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI