Global Patent Index - EP 1238344 A2

EP 1238344 A2 2002-09-11 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRESENTING AN ANIMATED ADVERTISEMENT ON A WEB PAGE

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PRESENTING AN ANIMATED ADVERTISEMENT ON A WEB PAGE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM PRÄSENTIEREN VON ANIMIERTEN REKLAMEN AUF EINER INTERNET-SEITE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE PRESENTATION D'UNE PUBLICITE ANIMEE SUR UNE PAGE WEB

Publication

EP 1238344 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00979902 A

Priority

  • IL 0000796 W
  • IL 13356099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0144969A2] A method for presenting an animated advertisement on a web page, in which a web server obtains a web page layer adapted to contain an animated advertisement content having at least one object adapted to run across a web page downloaded to a client computer connected to the web server without obscuring or disabling portions of the web page lying outside a boundary of the objects at any given instant of time. The web server then downloads the web page layer to the client computer for displaying the animated advertisement content in association with the web page. Preferably, the animated advertisement is displayed as a brief animated clip relating to a product or service to grab an observer's attention, and displaying a link to an advertisement stored in association with an advertisement web server associated with the product or service. This allows the observer to get further information relating to the product or service by clicking on the link. The animated advertisement thus serves as a teaser for enticing a user at the client machine to request an advertisement and the link serves as a reminder of the advertisement after termination of the teaser.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G06F 17/3089 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • WO 9957660 A1 19991111 - IWEB LTD [IL], et al
  • US 5983190 A 19991109 - TROWER II TANDY W [US], et al
  • "How to make a Flash movie with a tranparent background.", MACROMEDIA - FLASH TECHNOTES, 20 December 1999 (1999-12-20), pages 1 - 3, XP002906012, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.macromedia.com/support/flash/ts/documents/wmode.htm> [retrieved on 20030415]
  • WEGERT T.: "Shoshkele: What Is It, and What Can It Do for You?", 10 October 2002 (2002-10-10), pages 1 - 4, XP002906013, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:file://D:\My%20Documents\innovelty\checkmate\search\Shoskele%20What%20Is%....>
  • See also references of WO 0144969A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0144969 A2 20010621; WO 0144969 A3 20020307; AU 1727801 A 20010625; EP 1238344 A2 20020911; IL 133560 A 20010913; IL 133560 D0 20010430

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20041219

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI