Global Patent Index - EP 1238351 A1

EP 1238351 A1 2002-09-11 - ORDER CENTRIC TRACKING SYSTEM AND PROTOCOL FOR COMMUNICATIONS WITH HANDHELD TRADING UNITS

Title (en)

ORDER CENTRIC TRACKING SYSTEM AND PROTOCOL FOR COMMUNICATIONS WITH HANDHELD TRADING UNITS

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGEN VON BESTELLUNGEN UND PROTOKOLL FÜR DIE KOMMUNIKATION MIT TRAGBARER BEDIENEINHEIT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROTOCOLE DE SUIVI CENTRES SUR LES ORDRES POUR COMMUNICATIONS AVEC DES UNITES DE NEGOCE TENUES A LA MAIN

Publication

EP 1238351 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00968701 A

Priority

  • US 0027414 W
  • US 15798799 P
  • US 41327099 A
  • US 41315099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0126003A1] A computerized method and system for tracking orders implemented on a trading floor exchange is disclosed. The system is order-centric and is configured to route orders to a booth (110) and floor broker in accordance with a symbol associated with the particular security being traded. Floor brokers communicate with the trading system through handheld devices (114-116) connected to a handheld server (113) via a wireless interface. A specific protocol for communication between the handheld devices and the handheld server is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0126003 A1 20010412; AU 7857500 A 20010510; EP 1238351 A1 20020911; EP 1238351 A4 20030108; TW I223759 B 20041111

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1046967

2009-01-21 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080912

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021121

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI