Global Patent Index - EP 1238388 A1

EP 1238388 A1 2002-09-11 - PIEZOELECTRIC ULTRASONIC TRANSFORMER COMPRISING A HOUSING AND AN INSULATING LAYER

Title (en)

PIEZOELECTRIC ULTRASONIC TRANSFORMER COMPRISING A HOUSING AND AN INSULATING LAYER

Title (de)

PIEZOELEKTRISCHER ULTRASCHALLWANDLER, DER EIN GEHÄUSE UND EINE ISOLIERSCHICHT UMFASST

Title (fr)

TRANSDUCTEUR A ULTRASONS PIEZOELECTRIQUE COMPORTANT UN BOITIER ET UNE COUCHE ISOLANTE

Publication

EP 1238388 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00991061 A

Priority

  • DE 0004455 W
  • DE 19961095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145081A1] The invention relates to a piezoelectric ultrasonic transformer (1), comprising a housing (2) and a piezoelectrically active layer (4) which is connected to the housing (2) via an insulating layer (5). According to the invention, an adaptive layer (6) is also located between the insulation layer (5) and the housing (2), the thermal expansion coefficient of said adaptive layer having a value between the values of the thermal expansion coefficient of the housing (2) and the insulating layer (5). An ultrasonic transformer (1) of this type has a long service life even when used in an environment of frequent temperature fluctuations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 9/122

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/122 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145081A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145081 A1 20010621; EP 1238388 A1 20020911; EP 1238388 B1 20050302; US 2002180316 A1 20021205

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-04-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009672 P 20050407

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARGILLON GMBH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR