Global Patent Index - EP 1238412 A1

EP 1238412 A1 2002-09-11 - A VERTICALLY CONFIGURED CHAMBER USED FOR MULTIPLE PROCESSES

Title (en)

A VERTICALLY CONFIGURED CHAMBER USED FOR MULTIPLE PROCESSES

Title (de)

VERTIKALE KONFIGURIERTE KAMMER FÜR VIELFACHVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

CHAMBRE DE CONFIGURATION VERTICALE UTILISEE POUR DIVERS PROCEDES

Publication

EP 1238412 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00988135 A

Priority

  • US 0034377 W
  • US 46601499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145144A1] The present invention relates to a containment chamber that is used for carrying out multiple processing steps such as depositing on, polishing, etching, modifying, rinsing, cleaning, and drying a surface on the workpiece. In one example of the present invention, the chamber is used to electrochemically mechanically deposit a conductive material on a semiconductor wafer. The same containment chamber can then be used to rinse and clean the same wafer. As a result, the present invention eliminates the need for separate processing stations for depositing the conductive material and cleaning the wafer. Thus, with the present invention, cost and physical space are reduced while providing an efficient apparatus and method for carrying out multiple processes on the wafer surface using a containment chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 7/12 (2006.01); H01L 21/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/3063 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/6719 (2013.01); C25D 7/12 (2013.01); C25D 17/001 (2013.01); H01L 21/67028 (2013.01); Y10S 134/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145144A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145144 A1 20010621; AU 2437701 A 20010625; CN 1269182 C 20060809; CN 1423830 A 20030611; EP 1238412 A1 20020911; JP 2003517201 A 20030520; TW 501165 B 20020901; US 2002056646 A1 20020516; US 2002121435 A1 20020905; US 6352623 B1 20020305; US 6884334 B2 20050426; US 6969456 B2 20051129

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070112

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASM NUTOOL, INC.

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050228

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI