Global Patent Index - EP 1238413 A1

EP 1238413 A1 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR MAKING JUXTAPOSED ISLANDS BY AUTOMATICALLY CONTROLLED DEPOSITION ON A SUBSTRATE AND RESULTING STRUCTURE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING JUXTAPOSED ISLANDS BY AUTOMATICALLY CONTROLLED DEPOSITION ON A SUBSTRATE AND RESULTING STRUCTURE

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG VON NEBENEINANDERLIEGENDEN INSELN DURCH SELBSTORGANISIERENDE ABSCHEIDUNG AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT UND SO ERHALTENE ANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ILOTS JUXTAPOSES PAR DEPOT AUTOORGANISE SUR UN SUBSTRAT ET STRUCTURE AINSI OBTENUE

Publication

EP 1238413 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01974416 A

Priority

  • FR 0103026 W
  • FR 0012505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0229871A1] The invention concerns a structure consisting of a substrate whereof one surface bears juxtaposed islands, formed by a stack of single layers. The invention is characterised in that the islands are supported on a periodic array of stepped surfaces formed by the intersection of two arrays of steps, each stepped surface having a first dimension corresponding to the width of the step of the other array of steps, each stepped surface supporting at least two islands formed by a different stack of single layers whereof the composition is selected between a first composition and a second composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/20; H01L 29/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/02433 (2013.01); H01L 21/0243 (2013.01); H01L 21/02658 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0229871A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0229871 A1 20020411; EP 1238413 A1 20020911; FR 2814854 A1 20020405; FR 2814854 B1 20030725; JP 2004511100 A 20040408; US 2003064570 A1 20030403; US 7285378 B2 20071023

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081209

2008-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080527

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR