Global Patent Index - EP 1238425 A1

EP 1238425 A1 2002-09-11 - HEAT CONDUCTIVE SHEET AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SHEET

Title (en)

HEAT CONDUCTIVE SHEET AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SHEET

Title (de)

WÄRMELEITENDE SCHICHT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

FEUILLE THERMOCONDUCTRICE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CETTE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 1238425 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00975600 A

Priority

  • JP 34013899 A
  • US 0030614 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141213A1] The invention is directed toward a heat conductive sheet that has flexibility, can follow a specific shape such as ruggedness and curvature, which can therefore insure high adhesion and, at the same time, excellent heat releasing property, is free from the occurrence of wrinkle and rupture or elongation, even when the thickness is decreased, and is excellent in formability of sheet formation and in bonding work. Such heat conductive sheet includes a substrate and a heat conductive resin layer applied to at least one surface of the substrate, wherein the heat conductive resin layer is constituted as to contain a binder resin and a heat conductive filler dispersed in the binder resin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/373

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 7/20 (2006.01); B32B 27/20 (2006.01); H01L 23/36 (2006.01); H01L 23/373 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/3737 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0141213A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141213 A1 20010607; AU 1362501 A 20010612; EP 1238425 A1 20020911; JP 2001168246 A 20010622

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OKADA, MITSUHIKO

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: UCHIYA, TOMOAKI

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI