Global Patent Index - EP 1238435 A1

EP 1238435 A1 2002-09-11 - INTERMEDIATE SUCTION SUPPORT AND USE THEREOF FOR MAKING A THIN-LAYERED STRUCTURE

Title (en)

INTERMEDIATE SUCTION SUPPORT AND USE THEREOF FOR MAKING A THIN-LAYERED STRUCTURE

Title (de)

SAUGZWISCHENTRÄGER UND VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DÜNNSCHICHTSTRUKTUR

Title (fr)

SUPPORT INTERMEDIAIRE ASPIRANT ET SON UTILISATION POUR REALISER UNE STRUCTURE EN COUCHE MINCE

Publication

EP 1238435 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00993461 A

Priority

  • FR 0003482 W
  • FR 9915667 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145178A1] The invention concerns an intermediate suction support, having at least a suction surface (62) designed to receive a first surface of at least a substrate comprising an embrittled layer, a film being thus defined between the first surface of the substrate and the embrittled layer, the suction surface (62) of the intermediate support being the surface of at least a suction element (63) including suction means designed so that, when the embrittled layer is subjected to a treatment causing the film to be separated from the rest of the substrate, the film can be recovered. The invention is useful for making a thin-layered structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 31/0392; H01L 21/00; H01L 21/20; H01L 31/042; H01L 31/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/683 (2006.01); H01L 21/762 (2006.01); H01L 31/0392 (2006.01); H01L 31/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 31/1892 (2013.01); H01L 21/6838 (2013.01); H01L 21/76254 (2013.01); H01L 31/18 (2013.01); H01L 31/1896 (2013.01); Y02E 10/50 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1132 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1944 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145178A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145178 A1 20010621; EP 1238435 A1 20020911; FR 2802340 A1 20010615; FR 2802340 B1 20030905; JP 2003517217 A 20030520; US 2003047289 A1 20030313; US 2005270867 A1 20051208; US 7368030 B2 20080506

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081108

2008-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080627

2006-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR