Global Patent Index - EP 1238441 A1

EP 1238441 A1 2002-09-11 - BROAD-BAND SCISSOR-TYPE ANTENNA

Title (en)

BROAD-BAND SCISSOR-TYPE ANTENNA

Title (de)

BREITBANDIGE, SCHERENFÖRMIGE ANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE CISEAUX A LARGE BANDE

Publication

EP 1238441 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00969641 A

Priority

  • FR 0002905 W
  • FR 9914940 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139319A1] The invention concerns a broad-band antenna, characterised in that it comprises in a common plane two symmetrical parts (2, 3) each including at least two interconnected conductor strands (4, 5, 7, 8; 19, 20 21) powered by a double-wire line (10; 22), each strand comprising in its portion opposite the double-wire line, a resistive load (11, 12, 14, 15; 23, 24, 25, 26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/00; H01Q 5/00; H01Q 9/00; H01Q 11/04; H01Q 11/06; H01Q 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/46 (2006.01); H01Q 1/00 (2006.01); H01Q 5/00 (2006.01); H01Q 5/01 (2006.01); H01Q 5/364 (2015.01); H01Q 9/00 (2006.01); H01Q 11/04 (2006.01); H01Q 11/06 (2006.01); H01Q 11/20 (2006.01); H01Q 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/08 (2013.01); H01Q 1/002 (2013.01); H01Q 5/364 (2013.01); H01Q 9/005 (2013.01); H01Q 11/04 (2013.01); H01Q 11/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0139319A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139319 A1 20010531; AU 7930900 A 20010604; CA 2392696 A1 20010531; CA 2392696 C 20090602; DE 60004703 D1 20030925; DE 60004703 T2 20040609; EP 1238441 A1 20020911; EP 1238441 B1 20030820; FR 2801730 A1 20010601; FR 2801730 B1 20020118; IL 149780 A 20050517; IL 149780 D0 20021110; JP 2003516010 A 20030507; JP 4503903 B2 20100714; US 6768466 B1 20040727

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171017

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171016

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171010

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030820

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-11-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004703 P 20030925

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ANDRIEU, JOEL, JEAN-PAUL, FELIX

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BEILLARD, BRUNO

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IMBS, YVON

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI