Global Patent Index - EP 1238443 A1

EP 1238443 A1 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR FITTING AN OBJECT WITH A CABLE FORM COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE FLAT CONDUCTOR, AND ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC DEVICES CONNECTED THERETO

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FITTING AN OBJECT WITH A CABLE FORM COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE FLAT CONDUCTOR, AND ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC DEVICES CONNECTED THERETO

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BESTÜCKEN EINES GEGENSTANDES MIT EINEM AUS ZUMINDEST EINEM FLACHLEITER GEBILDETEN KABELBAUM UND AN DIESEN ANGESCHLOSSENEN ELEKTRISCHEN/ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR EQUIPER UN OBJET D'UN FAISCEAU DE CABLES CONSTITUE D'AU MOINS UN CONDUCTEUR PLAT ET APPAREILS ELECTRIQUES/ELECTRONIQUES CONNECTES A CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 1238443 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01980440 A

Priority

  • DE 10048693 A
  • EP 0111112 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0231925A1] The invention relates to a method for fitting an object (1) with a cable form (2) comprising at least one flexible flat conductor F1 - F4 and electric/electronic devices connected to said at least one flat conductor F1 - F4. The method consists in the following: preparing the object (1) and the at least one flat conductor F1 - F4 which is to be mounted on the object (1), wherein the electric conductor for contacting the electric/electronic devices is at least previously bared on one side in the sections of the flat conductor F1 - F4 which are used to contact the electric/electronic devices which are to be mounted on the object (1); the at least one flat conductor F1 - F4 is arranged as defined in a fully expanded, extended position on the object (1), wherein the sections of the at least one flat conductor F1 - F 4 with the bared electric conductors for subsequent contacting of the electric/electronic devices are disposed upon an element forming one part of a connector for contacting the electric/electronic devices which are to be mounted on the object; the object (1) is fitted with the electric/electronic devices which respectively have a counter connector element corresponding to an element associated with the object (1) in order to form the connector and which engages with the connector element associated with the object (1) for the electrical contacting thereof, in addition to being secured to said object.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/61 (2011.01); H01R 33/00 (2006.01); H01R 43/00 (2006.01); H05K 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/61 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0231925A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0231925 A1 20020418; AU 1228402 A 20020422; DE 10048693 A1 20020508; DE 50111683 D1 20070201; EP 1238443 A1 20020911; EP 1238443 B1 20061220; JP 2004511889 A 20040415; US 2003008534 A1 20030109; US 6648675 B2 20031118

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50111683

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-25 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50111683

- Effective date: 20120904

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110926

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110926

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070921

2007-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070208

2007-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111683 P 20070201

2006-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-12-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-12-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061220

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WELSCHHOLZ, JOERG

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DREES, ROLAND

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BENDICKS, NORBERT

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KERKMANN, DETLEF

2003-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ESDERS, BERTHOLD

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI