Global Patent Index - EP 1238454 A2

EP 1238454 A2 2002-09-11 - GILBERT-CELL MIXER USING BIPOLAR TRANSISTORS

Title (en)

GILBERT-CELL MIXER USING BIPOLAR TRANSISTORS

Title (de)

GILBERT-ZELLE GEGENTAKT-MISCHER UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BIPOLAREN TRANSISTOREN

Title (fr)

TOPOLOGIE DE MELANGEUR SYMETRIQUE DOUBLE A ENTREE ASYMETRIQUE

Publication

EP 1238454 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00992244 A

Priority

  • US 0042267 W
  • US 16718899 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139362A2] The mixer circuit is a singled ended input to a double balanced high dynamic range mixer with only two base-emitter junctions across the supply. It provides for the use of bondwires to off chip ground as DC block and DC feed elements. The single ended input and differential output balanced mixer is well suited for the input stage of an integrated radio receiver - off chip circuitry is usually single ended, but on chip circuits are usually differential. No off chip differential RF circuits or baluns are required which reduces off chip component count and improves radio performance. The mixer circuit has lower LO drive requirements because of the DC coupled LO port. This results in better radio performance and a smaller die area because of the DC coupled IF port.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03D 7/14 (2006.01); H03H 11/04 (2006.01); H03H 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03H 11/22 (2013.01); H03D 7/1408 (2013.01); H03D 7/1433 (2013.01); H03D 7/1441 (2013.01); H03D 7/1458 (2013.01); H03D 7/165 (2013.01); H03H 11/0422 (2013.01); H03D 2200/0023 (2013.01); H03D 2200/0043 (2013.01); H03D 2200/0047 (2013.01); H03H 2011/0494 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0139362A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139362 A2 20010531; WO 0139362 A3 20020711; AU 1628401 A 20010604; AU 3969501 A 20010604; DE 60006158 D1 20031127; DE 60006158 T2 20040819; EP 1238454 A2 20020911; EP 1245080 A1 20021002; EP 1245080 B1 20031022; WO 0139372 A1 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1050767

2007-06-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061228

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI