Global Patent Index - EP 1238490 A1

EP 1238490 A1 2002-09-11 - METHODS AND PROTOCOLS FOR INTRUSION-TOLERANT MANAGEMENT OF COLLABORATIVE NETWORK GROUPS

Title (en)

METHODS AND PROTOCOLS FOR INTRUSION-TOLERANT MANAGEMENT OF COLLABORATIVE NETWORK GROUPS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND PROTOKOLLE ZUR EINDRINGUNGSTOLERANTEN VERWALTUNG VON KOLLABORATIVEN NETZWERKGRUPPEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET PROTOCOLES DE GESTION DE GROUPES DE COLLABORATION EN RESEAU AVEC TOLERANCE D'INTRUSION

Publication

EP 1238490 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01932747 A

Priority

  • US 0113848 W
  • US 24748800 P
  • US 24718400 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0239658A1] Disclosed is a system for managing communications within a network collaboration group. The system comprises: a generator (110) for generating a new nonce value; an incorporator (120) for incorporating an expected nonce value and the new nonce value in a message to be transmitted; an encryptor (130) for encrypting the message; a transmitter (140) for transmitting the encrypted message from a sender node of the group to a recipient node of the group; and a verifier (150, 160, 170) for verifying, by the recipient node, that the encrypted message includes the expected nonce value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/00; H04L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 9/16 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01); H04L 12/24 (2006.01); H04L 12/46 (2006.01); H04L 29/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 41/00 (2013.01); H04L 9/0833 (2013.01); H04L 9/3271 (2013.01); H04L 63/0272 (2013.01); H04L 63/067 (2013.01); H04L 63/0869 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0239658 A1 20020516; EP 1238490 A1 20020911; EP 1238490 A4 20070718

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-07-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 29/06 20060101AFI20070611BHEP

2007-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 9/16 20060101ALI20070611BHEP

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUTERTRE, BRUNO

2002-10-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SAIDI, HASSEN

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR