Global Patent Index - EP 1238526 A2

EP 1238526 A2 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR SIGNALING AND PROCESSING INCOMING CALLS FOR A CALL CENTER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SIGNALING AND PROCESSING INCOMING CALLS FOR A CALL CENTER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM SIGNALISIEREN UND VERARBEITEN EINGEHENDER RUFE FÜR EIN CALL-CENTER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE SIGNALISATION ET DE TRAITEMENT D'APPELS ARRIVANTS DESTINES A UNE CENTRALE D'APPEL

Publication

EP 1238526 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00979678 A

Priority

  • EP 00979678 A
  • EP 0012607 W
  • EP 99125227 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1109389A1] The invention relates to a method for signaling and processing incoming calls for a call center. The invention further relates to a corresponding exchange and a corresponding call center. According to the invention, incoming calls for the call center and the subscriber numbers of the callers are signaled to the call center by the exchange via an internet protocol link between the exchange and the call center.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 3/523; H04M 3/42; H04M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/523 (2006.01); H04M 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 3/523 (2013.01); H04M 3/42068 (2013.01); H04M 7/0093 (2013.01); H04M 2207/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145372A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1109389 A1 20010620; CN 1199427 C 20050427; CN 1435044 A 20030806; EP 1238526 A2 20020911; US 2003076942 A1 20030424; US 7027584 B2 20060411; WO 0145372 A2 20010621; WO 0145372 A3 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100701

2008-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080212

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

2007-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR