Global Patent Index - EP 1238546 A1

EP 1238546 A1 2002-09-11 - CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (en)

CELLULAR RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZELLULARES FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS RADIO CELLULAIRE

Publication

EP 1238546 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00978640 A

Priority

  • US 0031276 W
  • US 45132899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141475A1] A cellular communications system including at least one base station (358), mobile stations (372, 374) addressable using IP addresses within a cell (350), and a controller (300) adapted to receive a context activation request from the mobile (374) to assign a static IP address previously assigned to the mobile when it was outside of the cell (350) and to assign the static IP address if the second controller (200) associated with the location where the mobile was previously registered with the static IP address has not already reassigned it, thus enabling roaming of the mobile between cellular systems under control of different Software and Measurement Infrastructures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04L 12/46 (2006.01); H04L 12/56 (2006.01); H04W 8/00 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 8/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141475 A1 20010607; AT 315299 T 20060215; AU 1608101 A 20010612; CN 1169385 C 20040929; CN 1402945 A 20030312; DE 60025396 D1 20060330; DE 60025396 T2 20060706; EP 1238546 A1 20020911; EP 1238546 A4 20030502; EP 1238546 B1 20060104; ES 2256065 T3 20060716; HK 1054146 A1 20050520; JP 2003516059 A 20030507; JP 4615172 B2 20110119; PT 1238546 E 20060531; US 6374108 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20180105

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., CHICAGO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., SCHAUMBURG, ILL., US

- Document: DE 60025396

2016-09-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60025396

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2015-10-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., SCHAUMBURG, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA, INC., SCHAUMBURG, ILL., US

- Document: DE 60025396

- Effective date: 20120113

2012-03-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC., CHICAGO, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA, INC., SCHAUMBURG, ILL., US

- Document: DE 60025396

- Effective date: 20120113

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60025396

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20120113

2012-01-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60025396

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2011-09-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS, INC.

- Effective date: 20110907

2011-06-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061114

2008-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MOTOROLA INC.

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060405

2007-08-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2007-08-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2006-12-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061005

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061114

2006-10-03 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20061003

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2256065 T3

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-04-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-04-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060404

2006-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025396 P 20060330

2006-02-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2006-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-01-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-01-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-01-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2006-01-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060104

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 A

2003-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/28 B

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR