Global Patent Index - EP 1238553 A1

EP 1238553 A1 2002-09-11 - FILTERING OF ELECTRONIC INFORMATION TO BE TRANSFERRED TO A TERMINAL

Title (en)

FILTERING OF ELECTRONIC INFORMATION TO BE TRANSFERRED TO A TERMINAL

Title (de)

ENTSTORUNG DER ELEKTRONISCHEN AUF EIN TERMINAL ZU UBERTRAGENDEN INFORMATIONEN

Title (fr)

FILTRAGE D'INFORMATIONS ELECTRONIQUES A TRANSFERER A UN TERMINAL

Publication

EP 1238553 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00972957 A

Priority

  • FI 0000958 W
  • FI 19992617 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0139577A1] The object of the invention is a system, a device, a terminal and a method for filtering electronic information to be transferred to the terminal through a telecommunication connection. The invention comprises attaching a specific filtering parameter (30 - 32) by the device transferring the electronic information to the electronic information for the purpose of filtering before the electronic information is transferred to the terminal through the telecommunication connection, and informing the terminal of said filtering parameter (30 - 32) before the electronic information is transferred to the terminal through the telecommunication connection. In the terminal, the steps comprise checking said informed filtering parameter (30 - 32) and allowing or preventing the receiving of the electronic information on the basis of said filtering parameter (30 - 32). In response to said allowing of the receiving, the electronic information is transferred to the terminal through the telecommunication connection, and in response to said preventing of the receiving, the electronic information is not transferred to the terminal through the telecommunication connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/00 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04L 12/18 (2006.01); H04L 12/58 (2006.01); H04L 12/66 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04W 4/12 (2009.01); H04W 88/18 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 67/2819 (2013.01); H04L 12/1859 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 51/10 (2013.01); H04L 51/12 (2013.01); H04L 67/04 (2013.01); H04L 67/16 (2013.01); H04L 67/28 (2013.01); H04W 4/12 (2013.01); H04L 12/189 (2013.01); H04W 88/184 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0139577 A1 20010607; AT 407532 T 20080915; AU 1151401 A 20010612; BR 0016025 A 20020806; CN 1183799 C 20050105; CN 1408190 A 20030402; DE 60040164 D1 20081016; EP 1238553 A1 20020911; EP 1238553 B1 20080903; ES 2312368 T3 20090301; FI 109319 B 20020628; FI 19992617 A 20010604; JP 2003515834 A 20030507; JP 2009116892 A 20090528; JP 4732656 B2 20110727; JP 4960338 B2 20120627; US 2005259604 A1 20051124; US 2010279719 A1 20101104; US 2012003997 A9 20120105; US 2012244893 A1 20120927; US 2014355498 A1 20141204; US 2017163756 A1 20170608; US 6947396 B1 20050920; US 7729301 B2 20100601; US 8165049 B2 20120424; US 8792398 B2 20140729; US 9491252 B2 20161108; ZA 200204370 B 20031231

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171101

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20141030

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120614 AND 20120620

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CORE WIRELESS LICENSING S.A.R.L., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: 2011 INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY ASSET TRUST, WILMINGTON, DEL., US

- Document: DE 60040164

- Effective date: 20120511

2012-07-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60040164

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20120511

2012-06-18 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: CORE WIRELESS LICENSING S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20120606

2012-05-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60040164

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

2012-04-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CORE WIRELESS LICENSING S.A.R.L., LU

- Effective date: 20120316

2012-04-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120322 AND 20120328

2012-04-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CORE WIRELESS LICENSING S.A.R.L., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOKIA CORP., ESPOO, FI

- Document: DE 60040164

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-04-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CORE WIRELESS LICENSING S.A.R.L., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: NOKIA CORP., 02610 ESPOO, FI

- Document: DE 60040164

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-04-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60040164

- Representative's name: TBK, DE

- Effective date: 20120215

2012-03-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: 2011 INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY ASSET TRUST

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-02-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60040164

- Representative's name: BECKER, KURIG, STRAUS, DE

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: 2011 INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY ASSET TRUST, US

- Effective date: 20111123

2011-07-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081204

2010-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081102

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081102

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-08-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-03-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2312368 T3

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080903

2008-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040164 P 20081016

2008-10-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI