Global Patent Index - EP 1238567 A2

EP 1238567 A2 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR FIXING THE HIFI POSITION OF AN AUDIO SYSTEM

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FIXING THE HIFI POSITION OF AN AUDIO SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG DER HIFI-POSITION EINES AUDIOSYSTEMS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DESTINE A FIXER LA POSITION HI-FI D'UN SYSTEME AUDIO

Publication

EP 1238567 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00984861 A

Priority

  • DE 0003762 W
  • DE 19959025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143502A2] The invention relates to a method and a device for displacing the Hi-Fi position (13) in a vehicle. The loudness levels that are transmitted by the loudspeakers (LF, LR, RF, RR) are measured on a reference position by means of a microphone (11) and according to frequencies. Said microphone is integrated into the car radio (10). The individual loudspeaker signals can then be changed specifically in loudness level and/or phase by means of the thus obtained data for displacing the Hi-Fi position to a desired location (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04S 1/00 (2006.01); H04R 5/02 (2006.01); H04S 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143502A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143502 A2 20010614; WO 0143502 A3 20020131; DE 19959025 A1 20010613; EP 1238567 A2 20020911; EP 1238567 B1 20040602; ES 2222258 T3 20050201; JP 2003516687 A 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006705

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111205

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101026

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101025

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222258 T3

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006705 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2002-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE