Global Patent Index - EP 1238569 A2

EP 1238569 A2 2002-09-11 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A PREDETERMINED OR PREDETERMINABLE RECEPTION CHARACTERISTIC ON A DIGITAL HEARING AID, AND A DIGITAL HEARING AID

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERATING A PREDETERMINED OR PREDETERMINABLE RECEPTION CHARACTERISTIC ON A DIGITAL HEARING AID, AND A DIGITAL HEARING AID

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER VORGEGEBENEN ODER VORGEBBAREN EMPFANGSCHARAKTERISTIK AN EINEM DIGITALEN HÖRGERÄT UND DIGITALES HÖRGERÄT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'OBTENTION D'UNE CARACTERISTIQUE DE RECEPTION PREDETERMINEE OU PREDETERMINABLE DANS UN APPAREIL AUDITIF NUMERIQUE, ET APPAREIL AUDITIF NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1238569 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99957244 A

Priority

  • CH 9900604 W
  • US 46195199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0022902A2] In order to generate a predetermined or predeterminable reception characteristic on a digital hearing aid comprising at least two microphones, the analog output of at least one of the microphones undergoes an analog-digital conversion (5a) with oversampling, is then subjected to a downsampling, and the time delay ( tau ) essential for adjusting the directivity characteristic is effected on the downsampled signal. A level adaptation (P) of both signals fed to a superimposition unit (11) by the microphones (3a, 3b) is also effected.

[origin: WO0022902A2] Zur Erzeugung einer vorgegebenen oder vorgebbaren Empfangscharakteristik an einem digitalen Hörgerät mit mindestens zwei Mikrophonen wird der Analogausgang mindestens eines der Mikrophone unter Über-Abtastung analog/digital-gewandelt (5a), dann abwärtsgetastet, und die für die Einstellung der Richtcharakteristik wesentliche Zeitverzögerung ( tau ) wird am abwärtsgetasteten Signal vorgenommen, ebenso wie eine Pegelanpassung (P) der beiden von den Mikrophonen (3a, 3b) einer Überlagerungseinheit (11) zugeführten Signale.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0022902A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0022902 A2 20000427; WO 0022902 A3 20010222; AU 1502500 A 20000508; CA 2390832 A1 20000427; DE 59906547 D1 20030911; DK 1238569 T3 20031103; EP 1238569 A2 20020911; EP 1238569 B1 20030806; US 6697494 B1 20040224

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060828

2007-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051209

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906547 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK LI

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI